Serial no. |
Name |
Duration |
1. |
Md. Mahbub Ali |
01/08/1979-12/01/1983 |
2. |
Md. Gias Uddin Ahmed ( In-Charge of) |
13/01/1983-21/09/1986 |
3. |
Mainul Ahsan ( In-Charge of) |
22/09/1986-18/10/1988 |
4. |
Md. Abul Kalam Mia |
19/10/1988-10/01/1993 |
5. |
Md. Nazrul Islam ( In-Charge of) |
11/01/1993-08/01/1994 |
6. |
Md. Kabel Hossain Deoyan |
09/01/1994-11/11/1999 |
7. |
Al Mahbub ( In-Charge of) |
12/11/1999-06/12/1999 |
8. |
Md. Nazrul Islam Khan |
07/12/1999-10/08/2003 |
9. |
Md. Altaf Hossain ( In-Charge of) |
11/08/2003-22/08/2003 |
10. |
Md. Nazrul Islam |
23/08/2003-17/03/2004 |
11. |
Begom Samia Sultana ( In-Charge of) |
17/03/2004-28/02/2010 |
12. |
Shah Md. Golam Moula ( In-Charge of) |
01/03/2010-23/05/2010 |
13. |
Md. Abdul Halim ( Current Charge) |
24/05/2010-15/11/2011 |
14. |
Md. Nure Alam Siddique ( In-Charge of) |
15/11/2011-01/01/2013 |
15. |
Kbd. Md. Abdul Halim |
01/01/2013-25/09/2014 |
16. |
Utpol Kumar |
25/09/2014-21/12/2014 |
17. |
Kbd. Md. Abdul Halim |
21/12/2014- |
Planning and Implementation: Cabinet Division, A2I, BCC, DoICT and BASIS